U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducheneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 25, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2018: [Request]
  • October 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 22, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 22, 2018: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.