U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Astin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 18, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 17, 2021: [Response]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extend]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 14, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • March 18, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 18, 2021: [Admission]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Submit Supplemental Briefing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 07, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 04, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 04, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • November 23, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 20, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 20, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 23, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 04, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 18, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
  • August 17, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 13, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 12, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 09, 2019: [Response]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 18, 2018: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • December 14, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 12, 2018: [Transcript]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Reconsideration]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 26, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.