U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 06, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 05, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 24, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.