U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 06, 2018: [Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Response]
  • October 26, 2018: [Request]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • October 23, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.