U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50240
  • Case Name: Julie Dawn Miller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.