U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Evaluation]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [Request]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.