U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lukkes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • November 17, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 22, 2021: [Furlough]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 04, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 01, 2020: [USCA Order]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 30, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 29, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 10, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 02, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 02, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • May 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 11, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2020: [Return of Property]
  • May 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 05, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 05, 2020: [Consent]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 27, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice]
  • April 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 12, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 12, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Request]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 12, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 18, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 17, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Request]
  • November 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Arrest]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.