U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dowty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 19, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 19, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 03, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 18, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • May 21, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2021: [Consent]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Text Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 24, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Verdict]
  • August 02, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • August 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 02, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 02, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • August 01, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • August 01, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • August 01, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 01, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • July 30, 2019: [Jury List]
  • July 30, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 30, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 26, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 25, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 24, 2019: [Objection]
  • July 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 15, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 24, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 13, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 07, 2019: [Discovery]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • May 27, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 24, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 23, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 22, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 22, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 10, 2019: [Brief]
  • May 10, 2019: [Objection]
  • May 09, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 08, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Reconsideration]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Request]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.