U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gienger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 27, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 25, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Evaluation]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 07, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Furlough]
  • January 02, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • October 26, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.