U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Runner Red Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 09, 2022: [Furlough]
  • May 06, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • April 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 28, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • September 13, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Furlough]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 01, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • February 05, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 01, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Admission]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 24, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 21, 2020: [Admission]
  • August 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 18, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 21, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 07, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 06, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 08, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 08, 2018: [Request]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 30, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.