U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • September 16, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 30, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 27, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 27, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 14, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 12, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • July 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 10, 2019: [Evaluation]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 22, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2018: [Request]
  • October 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.