U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pates
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 05, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Request]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Arrest]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.