U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2021: [Consent]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 18, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 25, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 11, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.