U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50242
  • Case Name: Tammy Kay Pickett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 19, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
September, 2021
  • September 25, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • September 18, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • September 04, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement]
  • August 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Codebtor Stay]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Codebtor Stay (Ch 12 & 13 only)]
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2019
  • February 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.