U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40522
  • Case Name: Georgia Jean Conrad
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Case]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Case]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.