U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lakes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 16, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 18, 2019: [Letter]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 15, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Request]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 25, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.