U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arrivillaga-Arana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 24, 2019: [Expedite ]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 06, 2018: [Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2018: [Response]
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Request]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.