U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50245
  • Case Name: Katherine Ann Knox
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Vacating Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Status Letter by Court]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Returned Mail]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Returned Mail]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Returned Mail]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Returned Mail]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Returned Mail]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • January 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.