U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Putzier et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 15, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 19, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 13, 2020: [Forfeiture]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Request]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 31, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.