U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50246
  • Case Name: Troy Dean Byrne and Janelle Genevieve Byrne
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
February, 2021
  • February 06, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Interim Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Interim Rpt and Applications for Compensation]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale (Text Entry)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reminder to File a Document]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property From Debtor]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Defer Discharge (Text Order)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Defer Discharge (Debtors Only)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule of Disclosures After Conversion]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.