U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 27, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • July 27, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 17, 2020: [Quash]
  • July 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 16, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 14, 2020: [Objection]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 07, 2020: [Objection]
  • July 07, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 07, 2020: [Suppress]
  • July 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 30, 2020: [Objection]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Hearing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [In Limine]
  • June 11, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 09, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 20, 2020: [Discovery]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Psychiatric Report Received]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Sealed Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 27, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 16, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 01, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 01, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Jury Question]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • October 31, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • October 30, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 30, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 30, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 30, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 29, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
  • October 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 25, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 23, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 23, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 17, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 09, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 02, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 01, 2019: [Text Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • September 30, 2019: [Brief]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 18, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 16, 2019: [Objection]
  • July 08, 2019: [Response]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Psychiatric Report Received]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 15, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 08, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2019: [For Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 31, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 22, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 09, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 19, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 10, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 08, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Request]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 31, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 31, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 30, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.