U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50248
  • Case Name: Karen Marie Besler
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.