U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davila-Marin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 09, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 21, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Request]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 07, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.