U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 09, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • November 07, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.