U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kach et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 15, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 14, 2021: [Response]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 13, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • December 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 08, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • September 25, 2020: [Transcript]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Extend]
  • January 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 29, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 13, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 13, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 09, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • January 07, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 07, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 07, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 07, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 12, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Request]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 04, 2019: [Extend]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • September 23, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 20, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • July 08, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • June 25, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 22, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 18, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 30, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 24, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2019: [Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 12, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 06, 2018: [Consent]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Request]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 07, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.