U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2024: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 09, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 24, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 11, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • June 20, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 16, 2018: [Request]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 08, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.