U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jandreau et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 22, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 18, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sever Defendant]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2019: [Reconsideration]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 16, 2018: [Request]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 08, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.