U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blaine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • June 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 15, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 14, 2018: [Remark]
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.