U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rios-Almaraz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • January 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Waiver]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 06, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment]
  • November 06, 2018: [Response]
  • November 06, 2018: [Request]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.