U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 01, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 27, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • November 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 13, 2018: [Request]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 07, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.