U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murphy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 30, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 14, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 13, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 13, 2018: [Request]
  • November 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 09, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 08, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 08, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.