U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response]
  • October 13, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Response]
  • December 17, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2020: [Response]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Response]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 27, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 26, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 19, 2018: [Suppress]
  • December 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 12, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 06, 2018: [Request]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 08, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.