U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Polley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2018: [Response]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 04, 2018: [Request]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • November 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 09, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.