U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Croyle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 16, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Finding of Probable Cause]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2018: [Request]
  • November 13, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 13, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.