U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Eagle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 10, 2024: [Release from Custody]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 30, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • November 10, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 19, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 19, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice]
  • July 06, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 17, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 02, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 31, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response]
  • July 06, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 16, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 13, 2020: [Furlough]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 04, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 04, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 31, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 21, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • July 10, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 10, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 10, 2019: [Request]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 01, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Text Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 24, 2019: [Request]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 10, 2019: [Request]
  • April 09, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 05, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 05, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2019: [Request]
  • April 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 04, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 21, 2019: [Furlough]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2019: [Consent]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 30, 2018: [Request]
  • November 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 30, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 29, 2018: [Request]
  • November 29, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.