U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Erickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 14, 2021: [USCA Order]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 02, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 04, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 20, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 18, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 18, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 18, 2020: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • May 18, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 01, 2020: [Mail Returned]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 24, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 21, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 21, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2020: [New Trial]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • February 14, 2020: [Seal Existing Document]
  • February 12, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 12, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [Seal Existing Document]
  • February 12, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Response]
  • January 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 22, 2019: [Acquittal]
  • November 21, 2019: [Acquittal]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 18, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 08, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 08, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 08, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Verdict]
  • November 08, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • November 08, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 06, 2019: [Jury List]
  • November 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 01, 2019: [Witness List]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 30, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 29, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 28, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Request]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 13, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 19, 2018: [Furlough]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Request]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 23, 2018: [Request]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 16, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.