U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walking Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 19, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 18, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 02, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 12, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2019: [Request]
  • August 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.