U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 04, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Request]
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2019: [Request]
  • April 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.