U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 19, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 16, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2019: [Request]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.