U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archambault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Request]
  • May 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 11, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 10, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2019: [Request]
  • February 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.