U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Featherman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 28, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 20, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 30, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 08, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 15, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Request]
  • June 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 23, 2019: [Request]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.