U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cr-40054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dandridge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • June 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 13, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 10, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 07, 2018: [Request]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Bail Report]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 14, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.