U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holzer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Furlough]
  • June 23, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 27, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [Request]
  • November 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Request]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.