U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilbertson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 11, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Request]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 26, 2018: [Request]
  • November 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.