U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extend]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 13, 2021: [Response]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extend]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Response]
  • February 09, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Supplement]
  • January 04, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 31, 2020: [Extend]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • October 01, 2020: [Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 25, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 23, 2020: [Response]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2020: [Supplement]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • August 31, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 28, 2020: [Admission]
  • August 28, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 25, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • February 20, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • February 19, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 19, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 18, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 14, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • February 05, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 09, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 07, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 23, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Verdict]
  • October 10, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • October 10, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 10, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 07, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 07, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 07, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 04, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 01, 2019: [Response]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 27, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 26, 2019: [Response]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 23, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 05, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 02, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 01, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 21, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 28, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 28, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • June 27, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • June 27, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • June 25, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 24, 2019: [Jury List]
  • June 24, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 24, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 24, 2019: [In Limine]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 17, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 17, 2019: [Response]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • June 13, 2019: [In Limine]
  • June 13, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 12, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 10, 2019: [In Limine]
  • June 10, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Request]
  • May 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 20, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 07, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 09, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 18, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 17, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 12, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2018: [Request]
  • December 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 29, 2018: [Furlough]
  • November 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 27, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • November 26, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.