U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Response]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extend]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 18, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extend]
  • June 13, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • June 08, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Recusal]
  • June 01, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 28, 2022: [Recusal]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice]
  • March 02, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 01, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extend]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • December 14, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 13, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 13, 2021: [Supplement]
  • December 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [For Order]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Discovery]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 14, 2021: [Discovery]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 22, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 22, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 21, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • January 08, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • January 06, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 06, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 27, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 26, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 26, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [New Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 22, 2019: [Verdict]
  • August 22, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 22, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Material Witness Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • August 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2019: [Arrest of Material Witness]
  • August 20, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 20, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 20, 2019: [Jury List]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 19, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 16, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 07, 2019: [Jury List]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 06, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 06, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 06, 2019: [Response]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 05, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • June 05, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 05, 2019: [Voir Dire Began]
  • June 04, 2019: [Jury List]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 04, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response]
  • June 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 03, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • May 28, 2019: [Jury List]
  • May 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 20, 2019: [Request]
  • May 20, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Waiver]
  • March 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 15, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 13, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 29, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 14, 2019: [Request]
  • January 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2018: [Request]
  • December 26, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 19, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2018: [Request]
  • December 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • December 19, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Request]
  • November 29, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 28, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 27, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 27, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 20, 2018: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.