U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grindstone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 21, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2018: [Reconsideration]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 26, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.