U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Shield Condon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 01, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 25, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 01, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 15, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 07, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • November 19, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 30, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 27, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Request]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.