U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tobacco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Request]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 16, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.