U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2018: [Request]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Arrest]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.